+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 112.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#786)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
March 31, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#183)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor