+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Reconsidered.
- Rules suspended.
- Veto message from the Governor received and read.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: House Vote on SB 145, AMENDMENT # 3590 BY ECHOLS, MOTION TO ADOPT (#826)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 81
- Absent: 10
May 27, 2021: House Vote on SB 145, FINAL PASSAGE (#827)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
April 26, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 145, FINAL PASSAGE (#100)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 145, CO-AUTHORS (#101)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor