+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2015: House Vote on SB 144, FINAL PASSAGE (#518)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
May 4, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 144, FINAL PASSAGE (#187)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor