+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/29/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 261.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 29. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (20)
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 143, CONCUR (#978)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2015: House Vote on SB 143, PREVIOUS QUESTION (#789)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 24
June 4, 2015: House Vote on SB 143, FINAL PASSAGE (#790)
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 6
May 4, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 143, FINAL PASSAGE (#186)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor