+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 435.
- Effective date 6/21/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Cortez, and Smith.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Zeringue, and Schexnayder.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received.
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
- Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 55th calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 8. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- By a vote of 88 yeas, 11 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2021.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2021.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Called from the Calendar.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (7)
June 10, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 142, ADOPT (#1134)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 10, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 142, REJECT (#1055)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
June 10, 2021: House Vote on SB 142, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1253)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
June 9, 2021: House Vote on SB 142, FINAL PASSAGE (#1182)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
June 9, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 142, 2/3 vote (#1018)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
June 8, 2021: House Vote on SB 142, TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH CALENDAR DAY (#1154)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 6
June 2, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 142, FINAL PASSAGE (#676)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor