+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 575.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 3 nays.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (5-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 135, CONCUR (#1263)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
June 1, 2016: House Vote on SB 135, FINAL PASSAGE (#1161)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
May 4, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 135, FINAL PASSAGE (#568)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor