+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 483.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 130, CONCUR (#1046)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 10, 2018: House Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#936)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
April 16, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#404)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor