+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 98.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: House Vote on SB 129, FINAL PASSAGE (#739)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
April 20, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 129, FINAL PASSAGE (#66)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor