+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 31, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2020: House Vote on SB 122, FINAL PASSAGE (#447)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 12, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 122, FINAL PASSAGE (#142)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor