+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Rules suspended.
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 25, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 122, FINAL PASSAGE (#1070)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor