+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 60. Failed to pass.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
- Notice given.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2013.
- Notice given.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 42. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
June 3, 2013: House Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#800)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 5
May 21, 2013: House Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#526)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 11
April 22, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 117, AMENDMENT # 1033 BY PETERSON, SB 117 BY APPEL (#124)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 6
April 22, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#125)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 5