+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 400.
- Effective date 6/19/2019.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Notice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
- House conferees appointed: Marcelle, Hoffmann, and Jackson.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
- Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged from Conference Committee.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Reconsidered.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Peterson, and Barrow.
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported favorably (20-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
June 5, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 109, CONCUR (#991)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 109, REJECT (#924)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 3, 2019: House Vote on SB 109, FINAL PASSAGE (#846)
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 17
June 3, 2019: House Vote on SB 109, FINAL PASSAGE (#846)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 16
May 20, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 109, FINAL PASSAGE (#387)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
May 20, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 109, CO-AUTHORS (#388)
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (26)
Regina Ashford Barrow
Type:
Primary Sponsor