+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 108, CONCUR (#603)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 28, 2020: House Vote on SB 108, FINAL PASSAGE (#543)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 11, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 108, FINAL PASSAGE (#98)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor