+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 214.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2013: House Vote on SB 107, FINAL PASSAGE (#652)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
April 18, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 107, FINAL PASSAGE (#96)
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor