+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Notice removed
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Vote
May 8, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 10, FINAL PASSAGE (#195)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor