+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
- The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0).
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2014: House Vote on HCR 88, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1611)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
May 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 88, ADOPT (#1625)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 5, 2014: House Vote on HCR 88, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#705)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor