+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 14, 2018: House Vote on HCR 83, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1013)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor