+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
- Notice given.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (20-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2017: Senate Vote on HCR 8, ADOPT (#770)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
May 18, 2017: House Vote on HCR 8, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#352)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor