+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
May 11, 2018: Senate Vote on HCR 73, ADOPT (#1026)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor