+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
- Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The resolution was adopted.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HR 69, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1052)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HR 69, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1052)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor