+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2018: Senate Vote on HCR 69, ADOPT (#1372)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 10, 2018: House Vote on HCR 69, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#920)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor