+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 57. Failed to pass.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 26, 2021: House Vote on HCR 68, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#703)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor