+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2017: Senate Vote on HCR 68, ADOPT (#574)
- Yeas: 38
May 22, 2017: House Vote on HCR 68, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#384)
- Yeas: 80
- Absent: 25
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor