+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Rules suspended.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0).
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on HCR 67, CONCUR (#1005)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
May 26, 2021: House Vote on HCR 67, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#714)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor