+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
June 1, 2019: Senate Vote on HCR 66, ADOPT (#697)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8