+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 77, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
May 11, 2018: House Vote on HCR 63, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#973)
- Yeas: 77
- Absent: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor