+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 62, ADOPT (#1175)
- Yeas: 39
April 29, 2014: House Vote on HCR 62, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#649)
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor