+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0).
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
May 26, 2021: House Vote on HCR 61, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#696)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor