+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
May 24, 2021: House Vote on HR 57, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#619)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor