+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2020: House Vote on HCR 56, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#641)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
May 27, 2020: Senate Vote on HCR 56, ADOPT (#381)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 20, 2020: House Vote on HCR 56, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#207)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor