+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
April 16, 2013: Senate Vote on HCR 56, ADOPT (#54)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor