+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2021: Senate Vote on HCR 48, CONCUR (#801)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
May 12, 2021: House Vote on HCR 48, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#398)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor