+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 42, ADOPT (#973)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2014: House Vote on HCR 42, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#547)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor