+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On October 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for concurrence on 10/23/20.
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 19. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 23, 2020: House Vote on HCR 36, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#262)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
October 22, 2020: Senate Vote on HCR 36, ADOPT (#211)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
October 21, 2020: House Vote on HCR 36, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#198)
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor