+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
April 15, 2015: Senate Vote on HCR 31, ADOPT (#33)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor