+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2018: House Vote on HCR 31, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#804)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on HCR 31, ADOPT (#656)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 16, 2018: House Vote on HCR 31, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#439)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor