+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 79, nays 8. The resolution was adopted.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013.
- Notice given.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2013.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0).
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: House Vote on HR 31, AMENDMENT # 4204 BY REYNOLDS (#873)
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 12
June 4, 2013: House Vote on HR 31, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#874)
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor