+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title,amended, roll called, yeas 31, nays 64. The resolution was rejected.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HR 30, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1054)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor