+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Called from the Calendar.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (9-0).
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2020: Senate Vote on HCR 26, ADOPT (#144)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
June 25, 2020: House Vote on HCR 26, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#129)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor