+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Vote
June 22, 2020: House Vote on HR 23, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#83)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor