+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
June 2, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 221, ADOPT (#1703)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (104)
Type:
Primary Sponsor