+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On October 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Rules suspended.
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On October 12, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On October 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
October 22, 2020: Senate Vote on HCR 19, ADOPT (#184)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
October 22, 2020: House Vote on HCR 19, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#234)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 17
October 13, 2020: House Vote on HCR 19, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#70)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor