+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Senate Vote on HCR 189, ADOPT (#588)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor