+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The resolution was adopted.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HR 175, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1043)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor