+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Rules suspended.
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On October 12, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
October 22, 2020: Senate Vote on HCR 17, ADOPT (#183)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
October 13, 2020: House Vote on HCR 17, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#85)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor