+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
- Called from the Calendar.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 17, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 17, ADOPT (#30)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor