+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The resolution was adopted.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (7-1-1).
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 2, 2017: House Vote on HR 166, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#644)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor