+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HCR 158, ADOPT (#1483)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 27, 2014: House Vote on HCR 158, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1190)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor