+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
+ − Vote
May 16, 2013: Senate Vote on HCR 15, ADOPT (#422)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor