+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, adopted.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor